US HB5694 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Contain Ebola and Stop the Epidemic Act of 2014 - Directs the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to prohibit from landing in the United States any aircraft that: (1) is being used to provide scheduled passenger transportation for compensation; and (2) departed with passengers whose air travel originated, or included a stop, in a foreign country in which there is an Ebola epidemic as determined by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC). Prohibits a consular officer from issuing an immigrant or nonimmigrant visa to any alien whose travel itinerary originates in, or includes transit through, a foreign country in which there is an Ebola epidemic. Requires the CDC to update and make available to the public a list of foreign countries in which there is an Ebola epidemic.
Title
Contain Ebola and Stop the Epidemic Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2014-11-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-11-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
World health
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/5694/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr5694/BILLS-113hr5694ih.pdf |