US HB579 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the U.S. courthouse located at 501 East Court Street in Jackson, Mississippi, as the "R. Jess Brown United States Courthouse."
Title
To designate the United States courthouse located at 501 East Court Street in Jackson, Mississippi, as the "R. Jess Brown United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8844-8845) |
2014-12-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 579. |
2014-12-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8844-8845) |
2014-12-08 | House | Mr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-09-27 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 58. |
2013-09-27 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-233. |
2013-07-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-07-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-18 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |