US HB5855 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Health and Human Services to establish a grant program for specified trauma centers and nonprofits to establish or expand intervention or prevention programs related to intentional violent trauma, excluding intimate partner violence.
Title
Bipartisan Solution to Cyclical Violence Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5814-5815) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5855. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5814-5816) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 484. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-586. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Detention of persons
Government information and archives
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Violent crime
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Detention of persons
Government information and archives
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Violent crime