US HB5862 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 relating to authority of U.S. Customs and Border Protection to consolidate, modify, or reorganize Customs revenue functions.
Title
To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 relating to authority of U.S. Customs and Border Protection to consolidate, modify, or reorganize Customs revenue functions.
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 12 (Y: 403 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-01-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-01-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 9 (Roll no. 12). (text: 1/16/2024 CR H141) |
2024-01-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 9 (Roll no. 12). |
2024-01-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H175-176) |
2024-01-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-01-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-01-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5862. |
2024-01-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H141-143) |
2024-01-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-01-16 | House | Mr. Smith (NE) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 0. |
2023-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-10-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security and Enforcement. |
2023-10-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |