US HB587 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fair RATES Act Fair Ratepayer Accountability, Transparency, and Efficiency Standards Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Power Act to permit a party to seek a rehearing and subsequent judicial review of any rate change filed by a public utility that takes effect without the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) issuing an order making such change effective. (Public utilities must give FERC and the public a 60-day notice before a proposed rate change can take effect.)
Title
Fair RATES Act Fair Ratepayer Accountability, Transparency, and Efficiency Standards Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H568) |
2017-01-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 587. |
2017-01-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H568-569) |
2017-01-23 | House | Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB186 (Related) 2018-09-05 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Public utilities and utility rates
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC)
Public utilities and utility rates