US HB5873 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-08 - Became Public Law No: 114-252.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-08 - Became Public Law No: 114-252.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 511 East San Antonio Avenue in El Paso, Texas, as the "R.E. Thomason Federal Building and United States Courthouse". This bill designates the federal building and U.S. courthouse located at 511 East San Antonio Avenue in El Paso, Texas, as the "R. E. Thomason Federal Building and United States Courthouse."
Title
To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 511 East San Antonio Avenue in El Paso, Texas, as the "R.E. Thomason Federal Building and United States Courthouse".
Sponsors
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-252. |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-11-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6493) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2016-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5886) |
2016-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5873. |
2016-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5886-5887) |
2016-09-26 | House | Mr. Davis, Rodney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2016-09-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 145. |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-772. |
2016-09-14 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2016-09-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-09-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2016-07-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2016-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Texas
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Texas