US HB5891 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve decisions issued by the Board of Veterans' Appeals.
Title
Veteran Appeals Decision Clarity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Luttrell [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-29 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-29 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-11-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-10-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5891/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5891/BILLS-118hr5891ih.pdf |