US HB5926 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the review by the Committee on Foreign Investment in the United States of greenfield investments by the People's Republic of China.
Title
Exposing China’s Belt and Road Investment in America Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Innovation, Data, and Commerce. |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-10-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2069 (Same As) 2023-06-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5926/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5926/BILLS-118hr5926ih.pdf |