US HB5931 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to report on barriers to making Federal Housing Administration (FHA) single-family mortgage insurance available for mortgages under $70,000. Specifically, HUD must report on policies, practices, and products used by the FHA and actions that will be taken to remove such barriers.
Title
Improving FHA Support for Small Dollar Mortgages Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2020-03-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1426-1427) |
2020-03-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5931. |
2020-03-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1426-1428) |
2020-03-02 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 0. |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability
Government studies and investigations
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing supply and affordability