US HB5988 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide special rules for the taxation of certain residents of Taiwan with income from sources within the United States.
Title
United States-Taiwan Tax Agreement Authorization Act United States-Taiwan Expedited Double-Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA] |
Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Elizabeth Van Duyne [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Michelle Fischbach [R-MN] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R-TX] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] | Rep. Burgess Owens [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 249. |
2023-12-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 118-309. |
2023-11-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 0. |
2023-11-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-10-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3084 (Same As) 2023-11-07 - Star Print ordered on report 118-107.
HB7024 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 349.
HB7024 (Related) 2024-03-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 349.