US HB6029 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
REGROUP Act of 2018 Reauthorizing and Extending Grants for Recovery from Opioid Use Programs Act of 2018
Title
REGROUP Act of 2018 Reauthorizing and Extending Grants for Recovery from Opioid Use Programs Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-06-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5121) |
2018-06-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6029. |
2018-06-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5121-5123) |
2018-06-13 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health programs administration and funding
Law enforcement administration and funding
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health programs administration and funding
Law enforcement administration and funding