US HB606 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-14. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-14. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income, for income tax purposes, amounts paid: (1) by the Bureau of Justice Assistance of the Department of Justice as a public safety officer survivor's benefit or a public safety officer disability benefit, or (2) under a state program that provides compensation for surviving dependents of a public safety officer who has died as the direct and proximate result of a personal injury sustained in the line of duty. The tax exclusion does not apply to any amounts that would have been payable if the death of the public safety officer had occurred other than as the direct and proximate result of a personal injury sustained in the line of duty.
Title
Don't Tax Our Fallen Public Safety Heroes Act
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Frank Guinta [R-NH] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 413 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-14. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2913-2914) |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-05-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 216). (text: CR H2846) |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2850) |
2015-05-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-05-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 606. |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2846-2848) |
2015-05-12 | House | Mr. Reichert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB322 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB279 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB916 (Same As) 2015-04-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 49.
SB279 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB916 (Same As) 2015-04-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 49.
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Taxation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Income tax exclusion
Law enforcement officers
Taxation