US HB6097 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State-Based Universal Health Care Act of 2018
Title
State-Based Universal Health Care Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, Armed Services, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6097/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6097/BILLS-115hr6097ih.pdf |