US HB6114 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 108-0)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Oversight and Accountability, Financial Services, Rules, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Oversight and Accountability, Financial Services, Rules, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To impose additional sanctions with respect to Iran and modify other existing sanctions with respect to Iran, and for other purposes.
Title
Maximum Pressure Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Oversight and Accountability, Financial Services, Rules, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-10-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2958 (Related) 2023-04-27 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4691 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2210 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB4691 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2210 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6114/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6114/BILLS-118hr6114ih.pdf |