US HB6142 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5337)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5337)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assuring Medicare Stability and Access for Seniors Act of 2012 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to extend for one year the Medicare physician payment rates without change.
Title
Assuring Medicare Stability and Access for Seniors Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-31 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5337) |
2012-07-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2012-07-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2012-07-18 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2012-07-18 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2012-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3630 (Related) 2012-02-22 - Became Public Law No: 112-96.
HB3743 (Related) 2012-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
HB3765 (Related) 2011-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 112-78.
HB3743 (Related) 2012-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
HB3765 (Related) 2011-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 112-78.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/6142/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr6142/BILLS-112hr6142ih.pdf |