US HB620 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-23)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require an annual budget estimate for the initiatives of the National Institutes of Health pursuant to reports and recommendations made under the National Alzheimer's Project Act.
Title
Alzheimer’s Accountability and Investment Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 0. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB134 (Same As) 2023-07-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 183.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/620/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr620/BILLS-118hr620ih.pdf |