US HB627 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
National Park Service 100th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue gold, silver, and half-dollar clad coins in commemoration of the 100th anniversary of the establishment of the National Park Service (NPS). Authorizes the issuance of coins under this Act only for a one-year period, beginning on January 1, 2016. Requires the Secretary to make bulk sales of the coins issued under this Act at a reasonable discount. Requires all sales of coins minted under this Act to include a surcharge of $35 per gold coin, $10 per silver coin, and $5 per half-dollar clad coin. Requires all of the surcharges received from the sale of such coins to be paid to the National Park Foundation for projects and programs to help preserve and protect resources under the stewardship of the NPS and to promote public enjoyment and appreciation of those resources. Prohibits the surcharges paid to the Foundation from being used for land acquisition. Directs the Secretary to take actions to ensure that: (1) minting and issuing such coins will not result in any net cost to the U.S. government; and (2) no funds will be disbursed to the recipients designated in this Act until the total cost of designing and issuing such coins (including labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, overhead expenses, marketing, and shipping) is recovered by the Treasury.
Title
National Park Service 100th Anniversary Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 403 N: 13 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2014-04-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 13 (Roll no. 183). (text: CR H3254-3255) |
2014-04-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3275) |
2014-04-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-04-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 627. |
2014-04-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3254-3257) |
2014-04-29 | House | Mr. Garrett moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1158 (Related) 2013-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Department of the Interior
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Currency
Department of the Interior
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources