US HB6342 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote and enhance outdoor recreation opportunities for members of the Armed Forces and veterans on Federal recreational lands and waters.
Title
MVP Act Military and Veterans in Parks Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
Rep. James Moylan [R-GU] | Rep. Laurel Lee [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-11-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2023-11-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-11-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6492 (Related) 2024-04-10 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6342/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6342/BILLS-118hr6342ih.pdf |