US HB6365 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 819.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 819.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Treaty of Guadalupe-Hidalgo Land Claims Act of 2018
Title
Treaty of Guadalupe-Hidalgo Land Claims Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 819. |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1052. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-27 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2018-09-27 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-09-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2018-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-07-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |