US HB6469 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To deauthorize a portion of the project for flood control and navigation, San Diego River and Mission Bay, San Diego County, California.
Title
To deauthorize a portion of the project for flood control and navigation, San Diego River and Mission Bay, San Diego County, California.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2020-04-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-04-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7575 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate.
SB1811 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
SB1811 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6469/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6469/BILLS-116hr6469ih.pdf |