US HB6482 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 to promote timely exploration for geothermal resources under geothermal leases, and for other purposes.
Title
Enhancing Geothermal Production on Federal Lands Act
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2024-04-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-04-16 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2023-11-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/6482/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr6482/BILLS-118hr6482ih.pdf |