US HB663 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Save Our States Act - Delays the effective date of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the health care provisions of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, and prohibits the federal government from promulgating any further regulations or otherwise preparing to implement the the provisions of such Acts, until the U.S. Supreme Court renders a judgment that includes a holding on the constitutionality of the requirement to maintain minimum essential coverage in any case pending before a federal court on the date of the enactment of this Act.
Title
Save Our States Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2011-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution. |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to House Appropriations |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-02-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Rules, Appropriations, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB281 (Related) 2011-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Comprehensive health care
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Judicial review and appeals
Supreme Court
Comprehensive health care
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Judicial review and appeals
Supreme Court
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/663/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr663/BILLS-112hr663ih.pdf |