US HB671 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ruth Moore Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to report to Congress in each of 2014 through 2018 on claims submitted for disabilities based on a covered mental health condition alleged to have been incurred or aggravated by military sexual trauma during active duty. Includes as a covered mental health condition post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD), anxiety, depression, or any other mental health diagnosis that the Secretary determines to be related to military sexual trauma. Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretary should update and improve VA regulations with respect to military sexual trauma by: (1) ensuring that it is specified as an in-service stressor in determining the service-connection of PTSD, and (2) recognizing the full range of physical and mental disabilities that can result from such trauma. Requires each veteran submitting such a claim to be provided the most recently updated regulations concerning such trauma, as well as other information designed to aid such claims. Extends until FY2019 the required rounding to the nearest dollar of VA basic educational assistance and survivors' and dependents' educational assistance.
Title
Ruth Moore Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2013-06-04 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2013-06-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-06-04 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3029-3030) |
2013-06-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 671. |
2013-06-04 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3029-3032) |
2013-06-04 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 38. |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 113-63. |
2013-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2013-04-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB294 (Same As) 2013-06-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Crimes against women
Disability assistance
Evidence and witnesses
Mental health
Sex offenses
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Congressional oversight
Crimes against women
Disability assistance
Evidence and witnesses
Mental health
Sex offenses
Veterans' pensions and compensation