US HB680 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-15 - Became Private Law No: 117-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-15 - Became Private Law No: 117-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
For the relief of Arpita Kurdekar, Girish Kurdekar, and Vandana Kurdekar.
Title
For the relief of Arpita Kurdekar, Girish Kurdekar, and Vandana Kurdekar.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-15 | House | Became Private Law No: 117-3. |
2023-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-28 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9738) |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-07 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5238) |
2022-06-07 | House | Considered from the Private Calendar. (consideration: CR H5238) |
2022-06-07 | House | Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration. |
2022-02-01 | House | Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 2. |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-237. |
2021-09-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-09-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-09-29 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |