US HB6856 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PEPFAR and Protections for Orphans and Vulnerable Children Act of 2018 This bill amends the United States Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria Act of 2003 to extend certain provisions related to the U.S. President's Emergency Plan for AIDS Relief (PEPFAR), a U.S. governmental initiative addressing the global HIV/AIDS epidemic. Specifically, the bill extends through FY2023 provisions that: require the Inspectors General of the Department of State and the U.S. Agency for Global Media, jointly with the Department of Health and Human Services and the U.S. Agency for International Development, to coordinate and conduct oversight of PEPFAR programs; limit U.S. contributions to the Global Fund to Fight AIDS, Tuberculosis and Malaria to 33% of funds contributed from all sources; require that certain fund contributions be withheld under specified circumstances, such as if funds were used to assist a country that has repeatedly supported acts of international terrorism; and require that more than half of the PEPFAR budget be allocated for specified HIV/AIDS treatment and care. The bill also extends through FY2024 annual reporting requirements relating to HIV/AIDS treatment providers and costs.
Title
PEPFAR and Protections for Orphans and Vulnerable Children Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2018-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3476 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6651 (Related) 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-305.
SB3476 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 619.
HB6651 (Related) 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-305.
SB3476 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 619.
Subjects
Africa
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Drug therapy
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
World health
Appropriations
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Drug therapy
Foreign aid and international relief
Government studies and investigations
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/6856/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr6856/BILLS-115hr6856ih.pdf |