US HB6858 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance authorities under the Defense Production Act of 1950 to respond to the COVID-19 emergency, to provide additional oversight of such authorities, and to require a strategy on securing supply chains for medical materials, and for other purposes.
Title
COVID–19 Emergency Medical Supplies Enhancement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Blood and blood diseases
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Department of Homeland Security
Disability and paralysis
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Indian social and development programs
Industrial facilities
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Manufacturing
Materials
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority health
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Small business
Strategic materials and reserves
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Worker safety and health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Department of Homeland Security
Disability and paralysis
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Immunology and vaccination
Indian social and development programs
Industrial facilities
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Manufacturing
Materials
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Minority health
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Small business
Strategic materials and reserves
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6858/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6858/BILLS-116hr6858ih.pdf |