US HB712 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Committee on Agriculture discharged.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Committee on Agriculture discharged.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Highlands Conservation Act to extend, through FY2024, funding for: (1) land conservation partnership projects in the highlands regions of Connecticut, New Jersey, New York, and Pennsylvania; and (2) Forest Service and Department of Agriculture (USDA) programs to assist such states, units of local government, and private forest and farm landowners in the conservation of land and natural resources in that region.
Title
To extend the authorization of the Highlands Conservation Act through fiscal year 2024.
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Garrett [R-NJ] |
Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] |
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2014-12-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 543. |
2014-12-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-712, Part I. |
2014-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2014-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1140 (Same As) 2013-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Connecticut
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
New Jersey
New York State
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Connecticut
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
New Jersey
New York State
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection