US HB714 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-261.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior, if the long-term benefit to the Virgin Islands National Park would be greater by entering into a lease than by authorizing a concession contract, to enter into a lease with the owner of the retained use estate for the operation and management of the Caneel Bay resort on the island in the Park. Allows the Secretary to acquire associated property. Sets forth the terms and conditions for the lease authorized by this Act, including provisions ensuring protection of the natural, cultural, and historic features of the resort and associated property, consistent with the laws and policies applicable to property managed by the National Park Service (NPS). Instructs the Secretary, in determining the fair market value rental of the lease, to take into consideration: (1) the value of any associated property conveyed; and (2) the value, if any, of the relinquished term of the retained use estate. Makes rental amounts paid to the United States under the lease available for visitor services and resource protection within the Virgin Islands National Park. Requires the Secretary to submit a proposed lease to Congress at least 60 days before the award of the lease. Prohibits the extension or renewal of a lease entered into under this Act. Requires, upon the termination of such a lease, that if the Secretary determines the continuation of commercial services at the resort to be appropriate, such services shall be provided in accordance with the National Park Service Concessions Management Improvement Act of 1998. Requires the owner of the retained use estate to terminate, extinguish, and relinquish to the Secretary all rights under the retained use estate and transfer, without consideration, ownership of improvements on the retained use estate to the NPS. Requires an appraisal that is agreed to by the Secretary and the owner to determine the value, if any, of the relinquished term of the retained use estate, to be conducted in accordance with this Act.
Title
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to lease certain lands in Virgin Islands National Park, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-08 | Became Public Law No: 111-261. | |
2010-10-08 | Signed by President. | |
2010-09-30 | Presented to President. | |
2010-09-28 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-09-28 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-09-28 | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H7008) | |
2010-09-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 714. | |
2010-09-28 | Mrs. Christensen moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H7008) | |
2010-05-14 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-05-13 | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3761-3762; text as passed Senate: CR S3762) | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with amendments. With written report No. 111-146. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. | |
2009-07-15 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. | |
2009-02-24 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-02-23 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-02-23 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1622) | |
2009-02-23 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 714. | |
2009-02-23 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1622-1623) | |
2009-02-23 | Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-27 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Land transfers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Virgin Islands
Congressional oversight
Land transfers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Travel and tourism
Virgin Islands