US HB7217 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 61-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 250 - 180 (Roll no. 38).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 250 - 180 (Roll no. 38).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making emergency supplemental appropriations to respond to the attacks in Israel for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024, and for other purposes.
Title
Israel Security Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass RC# 38 (Y: 250 N: 180 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 250 - 180 (Roll no. 38). |
2024-02-06 | House | Failed of passage/not agreed to in House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 250 - 180 (Roll no. 38). |
2024-02-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H483-484) |
2024-02-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2024-02-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-02-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7217. |
2024-02-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H476-483; text: CR H476) |
2024-02-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-02-06 | House | Mr. Calvert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6126 (Related) 2023-11-14 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure rendered moot in Senate.
SB3210 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB7271 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3210 (Related) 2023-11-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB7271 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.