US HB7218 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title III of the Public Health Service Act to extend the program for promotion of public health knowledge and awareness of Alzheimer's disease and related dementias, and for other purposes.
Title
BOLD Infrastructure for Alzheimer's Reauthorization Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 0. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 0. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3775 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7218/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7218/BILLS-118hr7218ih.pdf |