US HB7323 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to disapprove courses of education offered by a public institution of higher learning that does not charge the in-State tuition rate to a veteran using certain educational assistance under title 10 of such Code.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to disapprove courses of education offered by a public institution of higher learning that does not charge the in-State tuition rate to a veteran using certain educational assistance under title 10 of such Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Morgan McGarvey [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7323/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7323/BILLS-118hr7323ih.pdf |