US HB7329 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
Pending: House Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
Pending: House Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to establish Election Day as a legal public holiday, and for other purposes.
Title
Election Day Holiday Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Daniel Goldman [D-NY] |
Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA] | Rep. Jonathan Jackson [D-IL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Christopher Deluzio [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB11 (Related) 2023-07-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection.
HB6267 (Related) 2023-11-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SB1 (Related) 2023-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2344 (Related) 2023-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB6267 (Related) 2023-11-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Accountability.
SB1 (Related) 2023-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB2344 (Related) 2023-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7329/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7329/BILLS-118hr7329ih.pdf |