US HB743 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve rangeland conditions and restore grazing levels within the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument, Utah. Directs the Department of the Interior to implement a management program within the areas of the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument in Utah that are administered by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to: (1) improve rangeland conditions for wildlife and livestock carrying capacity in those areas, and (2) restore livestock grazing to the level of usage in those areas that existed as of September 17, 1996. Requires Interior, in issuing or renewing grazing permits and in issuing or modifying allotment management plans for livestock grazing in those areas, to incorporate standards and guidelines that are consistent with: (1) the "Utah Standards for Rangeland Health and Guidelines for Grazing Management for BLM Lands in Utah", approved by the Secretary on May 20, 1997; and (2) the applicable BLM regulations contained in regulations relating to livestock grazing on public land.
Title
To improve rangeland conditions and restore grazing levels within the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument, Utah.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB365 (Same As) 2015-05-21 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Livestock
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Licensing and registrations
Livestock
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/743/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr743/BILLS-114hr743ih.pdf |