US HB746 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Small Business Jobs Act of 2013 - Requires a federal agency, before any enforcement action is taken on any sanction on a small business for any violation of a rule or pursuant to an adjudication, to: (1) notify the small business that it may be subject to a sanction at the end of a six-month grace period following such notification; (2) delay further action for 15 days after such notification; (3) defer further action for the six-month period (allowing an additional three-month period upon application by the small business demonstrating reasonable good-faith efforts to remedy the violation or other conduct giving rise to the sanction); (4) make a further determination at the end of the applicable grace period as to whether the small business would still be subject to the sanction; and (5) upon a negative determination, waive the sanction. Makes the grace period inapplicable with respect to a violation that puts anyone in imminent danger, as defined by the Occupational Safety and Health Act. Makes null and void any sanction imposed in violation of such requirements. Requires: (1) federal agencies to report annually to the Small Business and Agriculture Regulatory Enforcement Ombudsman on the utilization of this directive and to disclose the penalty mitigation for small businesses, and (2) the Ombudsman to include such information in a currently-required annual report to Congress.
Title
Protect Small Business Jobs Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R-MI] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4304 (Related) 2014-06-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2216 (Related) 2014-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2216 (Related) 2014-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Small business
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/746/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr746/BILLS-113hr746ih.pdf |