US HB7841 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-13)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

The American PPE Supply Chain Integrity Act This bill requires the federal government to purchase medical supplies and personal protective equipment from the United States, with exceptions for small purchases. Specifically, the bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services, the Department of Homeland Security, and the Department of Veterans Affairs to purchase specified medical supplies (including disinfecting wipes and natural fiber products) and personal protective equipment (including surgical masks, face shields, and foot coverings) from products that are 100% grown, reprocessed, reused, or produced in the United States. The bill makes an exception for purchases for amounts not greater than $150,000. The bill applies the Berry Amendment (which requires the Department of Defense to give preference in procurement to domestically produced, manufactured, or home-grown products) to specified supplies and equipment, such as surgical dressing materials, hospital and surgical clothing, and textile medical supplies and equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The American PPE Supply Chain Integrity Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
2020-08-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2020-08-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, Veterans' Affairs, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, Veterans' Affairs, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, Veterans' Affairs, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, Veterans' Affairs, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, Veterans' Affairs, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, Veterans' Affairs, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, Energy and Commerce, Veterans' Affairs, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-07-29HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback