US HB7946 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide benefits for noncitizen members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.
Title
Veteran Service Recognition Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-06 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 213 N: 207 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - House - Passage of a Measure (Y: 220 N: 208 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-12-06 - House - Passage of a Measure (Y: 220 N: 208 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-06 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 220 - 208 (Roll no. 503). |
2022-12-06 | House | H.Amdt.331 On agreeing to the Gonzalez, Vicente amendment (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 213 - 207 (Roll no. 502). |
2022-12-06 | House | H.Amdt.331 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) and on the bill pursuant to the rule. |
2022-12-06 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1508, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Vicente Gonzalez amendment no. 1. |
2022-12-06 | House | H.Amdt.331 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gonzalez, Vicente. (consideration: CR H8770-8771; text: CR H8770) |
2022-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 7946. |
2022-12-06 | House | The resolution provides consideration of H.R. 3648, under a structured rule and H.R. 7946, under a structured rule. The resolution waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the remainder of the 117th Congress. |
2022-12-06 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1508. (consideration: CR H8763-8773; text: CR H8763-8765) |
2022-12-06 | House | Rule H. Res. 1508 passed House. |
2022-12-06 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1508 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3648, under a structured rule and H.R. 7946, under a structured rule. The resolution waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the remainder of the 117th Congress. |
2022-11-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 400. |
2022-11-15 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2022-11-15 | House | Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged. |
2022-11-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-558, Part I. |
2022-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16. |
2022-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-06-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1182 (Related) 2022-03-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB3212 (Related) 2021-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8084)
SB5055 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5553)
HR1508 (Related) 2022-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3212 (Related) 2021-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8084)
SB5055 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5553)
HR1508 (Related) 2022-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.