US HB7995 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the United States Mint to modify the metallic composition of circulating coins (including by prescribing reasonable manufacturing tolerances with respect to those coins) if a study and analysis conducted by the Mint indicates that the modification will reduce costs incurred by the taxpayers; be seamless, which shall be determined by verifying that the coins will work interchangeably in most coin acceptors using electromagnetic signature technology; and have as minimal an adverse impact as possible on the public and stakeholders. The Mint must notify Congress before making the modification and provide a justification for the modification.
Title
Coin Metal Modification Authorization and Cost Savings Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 343 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2020-12-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-02 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 343 - 41 (Roll no. 228). (text: CR H6037) |
2020-12-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6039-6040) |
2020-12-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-12-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7995. |
2020-12-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6037-6039) |
2020-12-02 | House | Mr. Clay moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-08-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2020-08-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4663 (Same As) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Metals
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Metals