US HB8112 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the federal cost share from 75% to 90% for any federal disaster declaration beginning on January 20, 2020, and ending on December 31, 2020.
Title
Increase Federal Disaster Cost Share Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-08-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8112/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8112/BILLS-116hr8112ih.pdf |