US HB82 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 189-62)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 372.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title II of the Social Security Act to repeal the Government pension offset and windfall elimination provisions.
Title
Social Security Fairness Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 372. |
2022-09-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 117-482. |
2022-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-20 | House | Assigned to the Consensus Calendar, Calendar No. 3. |
2022-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Social Security Discharged. |
2022-07-15 | House | Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mr. Davis, Rodney. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1302 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR1367 (Related) 2022-09-30 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Davis, Rodney. Petition No: 117-17. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HR1367 (Related) 2022-09-30 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Davis, Rodney. Petition No: 117-17. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)