US HB8266 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FEMA Assistance Relief Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FEMA Assistance Relief Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-09-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-09-30HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged.
2020-09-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2020-09-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2020-09-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6669 (Related) 2020-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4627 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback