US HB853 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Army Combat Action Badge Eligibility Act authorizes the Department of the Army to award the Army Combat Action Badge to a person who (1) participated as a member of the Army in combat during which the person was personally engaged with the enemy at any time from December 7, 1941, to September 18, 2001, and (2) has not been recognized previously for such participation. The Army may make arrangements with suppliers of the badge so that eligible persons may procure it directly from suppliers, thereby substantially reducing or eliminating administrative costs for carrying out this bill.
Title
Army Combat Action Badge Eligibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/853/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr853/BILLS-116hr853ih.pdf |