US HB861 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To terminate the Environmental Protection Agency. This bill terminates the Environmental Protection Agency on December 31, 2018.
Title
To terminate the Environmental Protection Agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] |
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/861/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr861/BILLS-115hr861ih.pdf |