US HB916 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing Chemical Facilities Antiterrorism Security Act of 2011 - Amends the Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2007 to extend until October 4, 2015, the authority of the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to issue interim final regulations establishing risk-based performance standards for security of chemical facilities and requiring vulnerability assessments and the development and implementation of site security plans for such facilities. Requires the Secretary, acting through the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) and in coordination with the Under Secretary for National Protection and Programs, to: (1) establish a voluntary chemical security training program to enhance the capabilities of high-risk chemical facilities to prevent, prepare for, respond to, mitigate against, and recover from acts of terrorism, natural disasters, and other man-made disasters; and (2) develop a voluntary chemical security exercise program to offer voluntary testing and evaluation of the capabilities of the federal government, state governments, commercial personnel and management, emergency response providers, and the private sector to prevent, prepare for, mitigate against, respond to, and recover from acts of terrorism, natural disasters, and other emergencies at chemical facilities.
Title
Continuing Chemical Facilities Antiterrorism Security Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2011-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Security Technologies. |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB908 (Related) 2011-09-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139.
SB473 (Related) 2011-10-20 - By Senator Lieberman from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 112-90.
SB473 (Related) 2011-10-20 - By Senator Lieberman from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 112-90.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Industrial facilities
Manufacturing
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Terrorism
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Industrial facilities
Manufacturing
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/916/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr916/BILLS-112hr916ih.pdf |