US HB941 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Became Public Law No: 117-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Became Public Law No: 117-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Stem Cell Therapeutic and Research Act of 2005, and for other purposes.
Title
TRANSPLANT Act of 2021 Timely ReAuthorization of Necessary Stem-cell Programs Lends Access to Needed Therapies Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 415 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-15. |
2021-05-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-05-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2550) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2021-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 2 (Roll no. 109). (text: 04/14/2021 CR H1752-1753) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1829) |
2021-04-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-04-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 941. |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1752-1754) |
2021-04-14 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB288 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S575)