US HB966 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the National Voter Registration Act of 1993 to prohibit a State from removing the name of any registrant from the official list of voters eligible to vote in elections for Federal office in the State unless the State verifies, on the basis of objective and reliable evidence, that the registrant is ineligible to vote in such elections.
Title
Save Voters Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
SB2747 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 2747 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 420) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
SB4886 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
SB2747 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to S. 2747 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 420) entered in Senate.
HB5746 (Related) 2022-01-19 - Motion to proceed to consideration of the motion to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5746 (Record Vote No. 9) withdrawn in Senate.
SB4886 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/966/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr966/BILLS-117hr966ih.pdf |