US HB995 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-08 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-08 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mammogram and MRI Availability Act of 2009 - Amends the Public Health Service Act and the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA) to require a group health plan that provides coverage for diagnostic mammography for any woman 40 years old or older to provide no less favorable coverage for annual screening mammography for such a woman, and diagnostic mammography, annual screening mammography, and annual magnetic resonance imaging for any high risk woman. Prohibits a group health plan from denying enrollment or renewal solely to avoid the requirements of this Act, providing monetary incentives to encourage women to accept less than such minimum protections, penalizing providers for providing care in accordance with this Act, or providing incentives to induce providers to provide care in a manner inconsistent with this Act. Applies such requirements and prohibitions to coverage offered in the individual market.
Title
Mammogram and MRI Availability Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-08 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2009-02-12 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Women's health
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/995/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr995/BILLS-111hr995ih.pdf |