US HB995 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
21st Century Respect Act This bill requires the Department of Agriculture (USDA) and the General Services Administration to change the terminology used to describe the racial background or place of origin of people in regulations concerning: (1) USDA programs for financing and insuring loans for properties in rural areas, and (2) the 1974 development plan for Pennsylvania Avenue in Washington, DC.
Title
21st Century Respect Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-300. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-11-28 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9448) |
2017-11-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 995. |
2017-11-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9448-9449) |
2017-11-28 | House | Mr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-28 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 104. |
2017-11-28 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2017-11-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-427, Part I. |
2017-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-08 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
District of Columbia
Economic development
General Services Administration
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing finance and home ownership
Racial and ethnic relations
Rural conditions and development
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
District of Columbia
Economic development
General Services Administration
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing finance and home ownership
Racial and ethnic relations
Rural conditions and development