US HCR174 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make a correction in the enrollment of H.B. 34. Directs the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make a correction in the enrollment of H.B. 34 (21st Century Cures Act) to change the official title to read "An Act to accelerate the discovery, development, and delivery of 21st century cures, and for other purposes."
Title
Directing the Clerk of the House of Representatives to make a correction in the enrollment of H.B. 34.
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-06 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | On motion that the House concur in the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House concur in Senate amendment: CR H7255) |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Mr. Upton asked unanimous consent that the House concur in the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H7255) |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.5137 Amendment SA 5137 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.5137 Amendment SA 5137 proposed by Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S6696-6697; text: CR S6696) |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6696-6697) |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-30 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text of measure as passed: CR H7048) |
2016-11-30 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7048) |
2016-11-30 | House | Mr. Lance asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced. |
2016-11-30 | House | Introduced in House |