US HCR179 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Secretary of the Senate to make certain corrections in the enrollment of S. 2943. Directs the Secretary of the Senate to make specified technical corrections in the enrollment of S. 2943 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2017).
Title
Directing the Secretary of the Senate to make certain corrections in the enrollment of S. 2943.
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7102; text as passed Senate: CR S7102) |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-12-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-05 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7178) |
2016-12-05 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7178) |
2016-12-05 | House | Introduced in House |