US HCR21 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby. Permits the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby Association to sponsor soap box derby races as a free public event on the Capitol grounds on June 20, 2015.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby.
Sponsors
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2417) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-04-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2332) |
2015-04-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 21. |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2332-2333) |
2015-04-21 | House | Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 22. |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-86. |
2015-04-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-15 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR119 (Related) 2016-06-08 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.